skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/06/22 20:50:46 PM

Horvath, Aaron Isaac

CPSO#: 98390

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital - Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Fax: 416-586-4719 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Aaron Horvath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Horvath ( CPSO# 98390 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Health Complex
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5058

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Health Complex
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5058

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AARON ISAAC HORVATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORVATH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2015