skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/06/22 14:42:18 PM

Lee, Karen Grace

CPSO#: 98385

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
890-151 Bloor St W
Bloom Family Practice
Toronto ON  M5S 1S4
Phone: 647-420-5033
Fax: 647-480-5033 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
77 Grenville Street, 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Fax: (416) 323-6332
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hannam Fertility
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3R2
Canada
Phone: (416) 595-152
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Karen Grace Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lee ( CPSO# 98385 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
77 Grenville, 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Business Address:
9th Floor
1240 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 969-3240

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
15th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
151 Bloor St W
Bloom Family Practice Inc.
Toronto ON  M5S 1S4
Phone Number: 647-420-5033

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN GRACE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014