THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:59:33 AM
Ooi, See Wei
CPSO#:
98349
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Dundee, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. See Wei Ooi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Feb 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 10 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 11 Feb 2019 to 17 May 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2021 |