THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:53:36 AM
Mariscal de Alba, Maria Andrea
CPSO#:
98337
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Universidad Autonoma De Madrid, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Spain
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jul 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 15 Aug 2012
PEAP - CF - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2012 to 31 May 2013
CF - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2027 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
|
Active |