skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 30/06/22 21:59:47 PM

Jung, James Jiuk

CPSO#: 98308

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 May 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
16CC-056a
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 4168645622 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:09 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES JIUK JUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2021