THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:21:49 AM
Sehr Ansari, Najmus
CPSO#:
98224
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Nov 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Karachi, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Nov 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:11 Nov 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2022 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 15 Nov 2029 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Nov 2022 |
|
Active |