skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/07/21 18:31:53 PM

Silverberg, Rory Michael William

CPSO#: 98223

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
308-1265 Arthur St E
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone: (807) 622-5452
Fax: (807) 622-5710 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

908 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

110 Victoria Ave
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Canada
Phone: (807) 274-3261
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09

1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Canada
Phone: (807) 737-3030
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

21 Sylvan St
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9861
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rory Silverberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Silverberg ( CPSO# 98223 )

Business Address:
1265 Arthur Street East
Suite 308
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone Number: (807) 622-5452

Business Address:
908 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3261

Business Address:
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Business Address:
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:29 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RORY MICHAEL WILLIAM SILVERBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 30 Jul 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
AVP - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 28 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 30 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 30 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 29 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2017