THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:10:29 AM
Klostranec, Jesse Michael
CPSO#:
98198
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic and Interv
The Montreal Neurological Institute
3801 Rue University, Room 540A
Montreal QC H3A 2B4
Phone: 5143981908
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neuroradiology |
Effective:24 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSE MICHAEL KLOSTRANEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLOSTRANEC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |