THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:45:45 PM
Chung, Andrew David
CPSO#:
98193
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Feb 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L2V7
Phone: 613-548-2301
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2018 |