skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/07/21 16:27:04 PM

Jeimy, Samira

CPSO#: 98161

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 May 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare London
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Rm B3-112 - 268 Grosvenor St
London, Ontario N6A 4V2
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: 519-685-8167
Fax: 519-685-8274 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Samira Jeimy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jeimy ( CPSO# 98161 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare London
Department of Clinical Immunology
Room B3-112
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMIRA JEIMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEIMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 28 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 19 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 19 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology

Western University, 19 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Western University, 01 Jul 2018 to 18 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2018