THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:42:21 AM
Chandhoke, Gursimran
CPSO#:
98136
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Center
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa, ON
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GURSIMRAN CHANDHOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDHOKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 11 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 11 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |