skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 9:24:34 AM

Orava, Matthew Victor

CPSO#: 98099

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 792-3333
Fax: (705) 728-4120 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Family Medicine Clinic
125 Bell Farm Rd. Ste 101
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Canada
Phone: (705) 721-1689
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Barrie Family Medicine Clinic
829 Big Bay Point Rd. Unit D2
Barrie ON  L4M 4S6
Canada
Phone: (705) 721-1689
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.V. Orava Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Orava ( CPSO# 98099 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-3333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW VICTOR ORAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORAVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014