skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 9:45:47 AM

Guha, Daipayan

CPSO#: 98089

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
M6-100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100 Ext. 87576 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Daipayan Guha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Guha ( CPSO# 98089 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:17 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAIPAYAN GUHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2021