skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 1:01:09 AM

Patel, Neeraj

CPSO#: 98067

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Huron Medical Centre
23 Huron St W
Exeter, ON
N0M 1S2
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone: 519-235-3343
Fax: 519-235-3845 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Neeraj Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Patel ( CPSO# 98067 )

Business Address:
23 Huron St W
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: 5192353343

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Huron Hospital Exeter

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEERAJ PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014