skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/10/21 3:46:15 AM

Johnson, Anna

CPSO#: 98043

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
59 King St W
Forest ON  N0N 1J0
Phone: 519-786-4545
Fax: 519-786-3023 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

139 Main St
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0
Canada
Phone: (519) 227-1268
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T.A. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Johnson ( CPSO# 98043 )
Dr. T. Johnson ( CPSO# 98063 )

Business Address:
139 Main Street
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0
Phone Number: (519) 227-1268

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
3-59 King Street West
Forest ON  N0N 1J0
Phone Number: (519) 786-4545

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNA JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Jan 2016 to 26 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Feb 2016 to 26 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History