skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/08/21 7:57:07 AM

Bondy, Jennifer

CPSO#: 98035

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
721 Front Road South
Amherstburg ON  N9V2M4
Phone: 519-736-7770
Fax: 519-736-7702 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

CMHA Health Centre
1400 Windsor Ave
Windsor ON  N8X 3L9
Canada
Phone: 519-971-0116
Fax: 519-252-5646
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER BONDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2015