THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:28:00 AM
Connolly, Michael James
CPSO#:
98007
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES CONNOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNOLLY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2018 |