THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:02:22 PM
Cho, Dennis Dane
CPSO#:
98001
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
RFE Building, Ground Floor
Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3946
Fax: 416-340-4300
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DENNIS DANE CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |