THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:32:32 AM
Roach-Fox, Elizabeth Emily
CPSO#:
97997
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Roach, Elizabeth Emily (used until: 14 May 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
600 Sanatorium Rd
London ON N6H 3W7
Phone: 519 858 2774
Fax: 519 858 9789
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:26 Dec 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH EMILY ROACH-FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROACH-FOX is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Dec 2016 |