THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:36:18 PM
Smith, Andrew Lawrence
CPSO#:
97992
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 78033
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Aug 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW LAWRENCE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 09 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 26 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2021 |