THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 2:35:45 AM
Butt, Aeysha
CPSO#:
97973
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Apr 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Butt, Aeysha Saleem (used until: 26 Mar 2019 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON L9M1B9
Phone: 7055493939
Fax: 7055490029
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Georgian Bay General Hospital,Penetanguishene Site |
Penetanguishene |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AEYSHA BUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2019 |