skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 6:02:29 AM

Lim Fat, Mary Jane Li-Chin

CPSO#: 97884

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY JANE LI-CHIN LIM FAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM FAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2020