skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/21 23:34:54 PM

Loganathan, Mayura

CPSO#: 97882

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Fourth Floor PO Box 25
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5159
Fax: (416) 586-3175 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1515 Birchmount Rd. #5
Toronto ON  M1P 2G7
Canada
Phone: 416-285-6111
Fax: 416-285-4883
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Loganathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Loganathan ( CPSO# 97882 )

Business Address:
5-1515 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1P 2G7
Phone Number: (416) 285-6111

Business Address:
Mt. Sinai Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Fourth Floor PO Box 25
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-5159

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAYURA LOGANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014