THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:43:32 AM
Katz, Noam Seth
CPSO#:
97868
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
409 Taché Ave
Winnipeg MB R2H 2A6
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:07 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NOAM SETH KATZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Sep 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2022 |