THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:22:09 PM
Salehi, Fateme
CPSO#:
97852
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FATEME SALEHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 02 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |