skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 14:20:29 PM

Wais, Marta Ewa

CPSO#: 97844

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Fertility Centre
5th floor
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: 905-201-3414
Fax: 905-201-3414 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Marta Wais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wais ( CPSO# 97844 )

Business Address:
Markham Fertility Centre
5th Floor
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility Effective:24 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARTA EWA WAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017