THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:00:34 PM
Saffie, Medina Gehaan
CPSO#:
97839
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sarkar, Medina Gehaan (used until: 25 Jun 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: (905) 681-4879
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:20 Feb 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEDINA GEHAAN SAFFIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFFIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 20 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 21 Feb 2018 to 31 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2018 |