skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/22 1:51:07 AM

Amos, Elizabeth Jane

CPSO#: 97785

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2022
EXPIRY DATE
08 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
60 Murray St. 4th Floor
Toronto, ON
M5T 3L9
Date Received: 08 Jun 2022


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2015 to 15 Dec 2015
EL - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2022