skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 1:12:29 AM

Waller, Brittany Ann Marie

CPSO#: 97754

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dermatology on Bloor
29 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N2
Phone: (416) 922-6869 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

775 Monaghan Rd
SKiN Laser Clinic
Peterborough ON  K9J 5K2
Canada
Phone: 705-775-3223
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brittany Waller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Waller ( CPSO# 97754 )

Business Address:
775 Monaghan Rd
Peterborough ON  K9J 5K2
Phone Number: 705-775-3223

Business Address:
Dermatology on Bloor
29 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 922-6809

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRITTANY ANN MARIE WALLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017