skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/10/21 1:15:08 AM

Kristof, Lorand

CPSO#: 97745

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Malton Village LTC
7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 4M1
Canada
Phone: (905) 791-1179
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Davis Centre LTC
80 Allan Dr. Bolton
Bolton ON  L7E 1P7
Canada
Phone: 905-857-0975
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lorand Kristof Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kristof ( CPSO# 97745 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Malton Village LTC
7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 2W2
Phone Number: (905) 791-1179

Business Address:
Gateway Medical Clinic
25 Gateway Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 4X2

Business Address:
80 Allan Dr
Davis Centre LTC
Bolton ON  L7E 1P7


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:13 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LORAND KRISTOF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISTOF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2014