THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:39:36 AM
Saunders, Brooke
CPSO#:
97735
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Saunders, Brooke Rachel (used until: 10 Jun 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-338-4690 Ext. 4605
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:22 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BROOKE SAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
EL - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2015 |