skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/10/21 0:14:20 AM

Fung, Filgen Yut-Tou

CPSO#: 97732

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
2nd Floor, Room 252
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76993 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brant Hospital
Emergency Department
1245 North Shore Boulevard E
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Filgen Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Fung ( CPSO# 97732 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital, Division of Emergency M
237 Barton St E
2nd Floor, Room 252
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital, Emergency Department
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:01 Nov 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FILGEN YUT-TOU FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2016 to 01 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 02 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 02 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 01 Nov 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 02 Nov 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 01 Nov 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 02 Nov 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 01 Nov 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Oct 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2020