THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:13:19 AM
Anselm, Daniel Dominic
CPSO#:
97720
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
03 May 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Jan 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2018 to 09 Feb 2018
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2018 to 27 Jul 2018
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2019 to 03 May 2019
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Feb 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 May 2019 |