THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:43:50 AM
Elarabi, Mohamed Farouk Radwan
CPSO#:
97707
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cleveland Clinic Abu Dhabi
Sowwah Square, Al Maryah Island
Abu Dhabi 112412
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 0097126590200 Ext. 68107
Fax: 0097126435377
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
United Arab Emirates
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Rheumatology |
Effective:11 Sep 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PEAP - R - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Sep 2015
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jan 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jan 2018 |
|
Active |