skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/10/21 12:43:19 PM

Doad, Ajinder Kaur

CPSO#: 97695

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Nov 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Russian, Urdu

Education:Kharkov Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tower Hill Medical Centre
380 Tower HIll Road , Unit 17
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0T8
Phone: 289-475-6104
Fax: 905-770-9579 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ajinder Doad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Doad ( CPSO# 97695 )

Business Address:
Unit 17
380 Tower Hill Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0T8
Phone Number: (289) 475-6104

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AJINDER KAUR DOAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2014