THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 12:05:18 PM
Steinmann, Tamra Marian
CPSO#:
97691
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
180 Cambria Rd N
Maitland Valley Family Health Team
Goderich ON N7A 4N8
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
Seaforth Community Hospital |
Seaforth |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Wingham and District Hospital |
Wingham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:04 Nov 2020 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAMRA MARIAN STEINMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINMANN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2014 |