skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/07/21 15:43:33 PM

Raveendran, Gayathtri

CPSO#: 97688

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hub
2660 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1K 2S3
Phone: 416-640-7391
Fax: 416-261-1896 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Toronto Scarborough
Student Centre, SL-270
1265 Military Trail
Scarborough ON  M1C 1A4
Canada
Phone: (416) 287-7065
Fax: (416) 287-7069
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Raveendran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Raveendran ( CPSO# 97688 )

Business Address:
University of Toronto-Scarborough
Student Centre
Room SL-270
1265 Military Trail
Scarborough ON  M1C 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 287-7065

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAYATHTRI RAVEENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVEENDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014