THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 22:19:03 PM
Alsawas, Suzanne Nicole
CPSO#:
97668
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Apr 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ettie, Suzanne Nicole (used until: 01 May 2023 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
P.O. Box 37053
6020 Malden Road
LaSalle ON N9H 1S0
Phone: (647) 273-9696
Fax: (647) 490-4808
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUZANNE NICOLE ALSAWAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSAWAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2019 |