THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:06:07 PM
Zroback, Jesse Peter
CPSO#:
97667
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
375 2nd Ave
North Island Hospital Campbell Rive
Emergency Department
Campbell River BC V9W 3V1
Phone: (250) 286-7100
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Geraldton District Hospital |
Geraldton |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital |
Nipigon |
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital |
Red Lake |
Sante Manitouwadge Health |
Manitouwadge |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Wilson Memorial General Hospital |
Marathon |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:08 Oct 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSE PETER ZROBACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZROBACK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2014 |