skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 15:57:47 PM

Tripic, Miljan

CPSO#: 97655

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
564 Belmont Avenue West
Unit 302
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 742-0495
Fax: (519) 571-7555 Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MILJAN TRIPIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRIPIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
AVP - Neurology

Western University, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2017