THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:00:32 PM
Oakton, Suzannah Elizabeth
CPSO#:
97644
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Nottingham, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph, ON N1T 2G4
Date Received: 19 Apr 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Aug 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 29 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |