THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
11/05/24 5:13:40 AM
Bocicariu, Alina Marinela
CPSO#:
97638
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Laboratory Medicine
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALINA MARINELA BOCICARIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOCICARIU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Laboratory Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2018 |