THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:17:21 PM
Van Meer, Ryan Donald
CPSO#:
97624
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300-1100 Burloak Dr
Burlington ON L7L 6B2
Phone: 416-777-9933
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:11 Aug 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RYAN DONALD VAN MEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN MEER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 16 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 11 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 12 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 11 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2018 |