skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/07/22 21:18:09 PM

Ponzo, Marisa Grace

CPSO#: 97617

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
D101-1390 Don Mills Rd
Canadian Dermatology Centre
North York ON  M3B 0A7 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Practice Address Not Available
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARISA GRACE PONZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONZO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2012 to 22 Jun 2012
EL - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2017 to 29 Jan 2017
EL - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022