THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:11:05 AM
Lee, Yoojung
CPSO#:
97601
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
Phone: 6137323675 Ext. 7209
Fax: 6137322085
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YOOJUNG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2017 |