THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:40:45 PM
Kalidindi, Navya
CPSO#:
97587
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
699 Concession St
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Phone: 905-387-9711 Ext. 63123
Fax: 905-575-6326
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAVYA KALIDINDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALIDINDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |