skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/07/21 14:17:33 PM

Chen, Jerry Yeou-Wei

CPSO#: 97572

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NeuroCare Neurology Neurophysiology
1110 Sheppard Ave E, Suite 402
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 224-1922
Fax: (416) 224-0056 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 4166035232
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JERRY YEOU-WEI CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 03 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017