THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 9:31:03 AM
Jiang, Yue
CPSO#:
97562
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Mar 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
330 Highway 7
Suite 511
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
Phone: 905-597-2080
Fax: 365-525-2000
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:01 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YUE JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Queen's University, 15 Aug 2016 to 22 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Queen's University, 23 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 May 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 2019 |