THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 19:12:03 PM
Hussain, Mohamad Anas
CPSO#:
97556
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
6-046 Donnelly South Wing
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-6047
Fax: 416-864-6012
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:04 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMAD ANAS HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2020 |