skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 21:25:42 PM

Siemieniuk, Reed Alexander Cunningham

CPSO#: 97548

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Mailbox 12P
Hamilton ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Weeraratne Siemieniuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Siemieniuk ( CPSO# 97548 )
Dr. A. Weeraratne ( CPSO# 101570)

Business Address:
408-1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 523-6766

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2423


Corporation Name: Siemieniuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Siemieniuk ( CPSO# 97548 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Mailbox 12P
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REED ALEXANDER CUNNINGHAM SIEMIENIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIEMIENIUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017